MI SB1357 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0611'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0611'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of tampering with or removing electronic monitoring device; enact. Amends sec. 17f, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.17f). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1127'12
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of tampering with or removing electronic monitoring device; enact. Amends sec. 17f, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.17f). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1127'12
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 813 (Y: 85 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 834 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 834 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0611'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 3:48 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 9:00 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:56 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 813 Yeas 85 Nays 24 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2012 |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 834 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |