MI SB1350 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0520'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0520'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; hunting; gray wolf; include in game list and authorize hunting season. Amends secs. 40103, 40118, 43503 & 43507 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40103 et seq.) & adds secs. 40110b, 43528b & 43540e.
Title
Natural resources; hunting; gray wolf; include in game list and authorize hunting season. Amends secs. 40103, 40118, 43503 & 43507 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40103 et seq.) & adds secs. 40110b, 43528b & 43540e.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1064 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 766 (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 790 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 766 (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 790 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0520'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 4:52 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2012 @ 9:23 Am |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:52 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 1064 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 766 Yeas 66 Nays 43 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2012 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Title Amended |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 790 Yeas 23 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
Same As/Similar To
HB5834 (Same As) 2012-09-11 - Printed Bill Filed 08/16/2012