MI SB1337 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0573'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sales tax; exemptions; exemptions for fund-raising by nonprofits and charities; clarify. Amends sec. 4q of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54q).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax; exemptions; exemptions for fund-raising by nonprofits and charities; clarify. Amends sec. 4q of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54q).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 873 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 773 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0573'12 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 5:40 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 11:51 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31SenatePresented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 3:00 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-14SenateFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-14SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2012-12-14SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2012-12-14HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-14HouseInserted Full Title
2012-12-14HousePassed Roll Call # 873 Yeas 107 Nays 0
2012-12-14HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-14HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-12-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-14HouseRead A Second Time
2012-12-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-12-13HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2012-11-29HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2012-11-29HouseRead A First Time
2012-11-29HouseReceived On 11/29/2012
2012-11-29SenatePassed Roll Call # 773 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-11-28SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2012-11-28SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2012-11-28SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2012-11-27SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
2012-11-27SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-11-27SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-2
2012-09-27SenateReferred To Committee On Finance

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-SB-1337
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2012-SIB-1337.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBS-1337.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBH-1337.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2012-SNB-1337.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0573.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-11-27-072.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-11-29-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-13-082.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-14-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback