MI SB1336 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0447'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0447'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; health and safety; occupational health standards commission; eliminate and update with federal hazard communication standards. Amends secs. 5, 14a, 14b, 14d, 14e, 14f, 14h, 14j, 14k, 14l, 24, 31, 54 & 63 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1005 et seq.) & repeals sec. 23 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1023). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5917'12, HB 5922'12, SB 1335'12
Title
Labor; health and safety; occupational health standards commission; eliminate and update with federal hazard communication standards. Amends secs. 5, 14a, 14b, 14d, 14e, 14f, 14h, 14j, 14k, 14l, 24, 31, 54 & 63 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1005 et seq.) & repeals sec. 23 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1023). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5917'12, HB 5922'12, SB 1335'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 728 (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 729 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 729 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0447'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 10:13 Am |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/22/2012 @ 10:20 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/20/2012 @ 4:28 Pm |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 728 Yeas 64 Nays 45 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Received On 11/08/2012 |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 729 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |