MI SB1322 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0570'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0570'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; other; amendment of motor bus transportation act to reflect transfer of duties regarding self-insurers from the secretary of state to the insurance commissioner; provide for. Amends sec. 9 of 1982 PA 432 (MCL 474.109).
Title
Transportation; other; amendment of motor bus transportation act to reflect transfer of duties regarding self-insurers from the secretary of state to the insurance commissioner; provide for. Amends sec. 9 of 1982 PA 432 (MCL 474.109).
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hune [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 788 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 783 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 783 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0570'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 5:34 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 3:39 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 1:20 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 788 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2012 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 783 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
Subjects
Insurance, no-fault
Insurance, self-funded
State agencies (existing), state
Transportation, other
Vehicles, buses
Insurance, self-funded
State agencies (existing), state
Transportation, other
Vehicles, buses