MI SB1320 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0569'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0569'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses; professional corporations; regulation of professional corporations; recodify in business corporation act and make general revisions. Amends secs. 105, 106, 108, 109, 123, 201, 202, 211, 241, 405, 488, 528, 564b, 565, 569, 611, 631, 641, 642, 643, 703a, 753, 762, 776, 781, 784, 804, 911, 1021, 1035 & 1041 of 1972 PA 284 (MCL 450.1105 et seq.); adds sec. 529 & ch. 2A & repeals 1962 PA 192 (MCL 450.221 - 450.235).
Title
Businesses; professional corporations; regulation of professional corporations; recodify in business corporation act and make general revisions. Amends secs. 105, 106, 108, 109, 123, 201, 202, 211, 241, 405, 488, 528, 564b, 565, 569, 611, 631, 641, 642, 643, 703a, 753, 762, 776, 781, 784, 804, 911, 1021, 1035 & 1041 of 1972 PA 284 (MCL 450.1105 et seq.); adds sec. 529 & ch. 2A & repeals 1962 PA 192 (MCL 450.221 - 450.235).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1051 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 781 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 765 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 781 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 765 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0569'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 5:32 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 3:37 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:22 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 1051 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 781 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 765 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-28 | House | Received On 11/28/2012 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |