MI SB1315 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0623'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0623'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; warrants; warrantless search of parolees; provide for under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 36 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.236).
Title
Criminal procedure; warrants; warrantless search of parolees; provide for under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 36 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.236).
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. Michael Green [R] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Mike Nofs [R] |
Sen. John Proos [R] | Sen. David Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1062 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 811 (Y: 80 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 770 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 811 (Y: 80 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 770 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0623'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 4:12 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:56 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:48 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1062 Yeas 29 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 811 Yeas 80 Nays 30 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | House | Amended |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-04 | House | Per Rule 41 Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2012 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 770 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |