MI SB1313 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0583'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0583'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; crimes against minors; copying or reproducing child sexually abusive material; prohibit, and restrict access to and reproduction of evidence of the violation. Amends sec. 145c of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.145c).
Title
Crimes; crimes against minors; copying or reproducing child sexually abusive material; prohibit, and restrict access to and reproduction of evidence of the violation. Amends sec. 145c of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.145c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1061 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 801 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 713 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 801 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 713 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0583'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 6:00 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 11:49 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:46 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 1061 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 801 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-12 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Received On 10/17/2012 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 713 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |