MI SB1305 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0441'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0441'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; property and casualty; rating and underwriting requirements; modify. Amends secs. 2110a, 2111, 2117, 2119 & 2121 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2110a et seq.).
Title
Insurance; property and casualty; rating and underwriting requirements; modify. Amends secs. 2110a, 2111, 2117, 2119 & 2121 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2110a et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hune [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 733 (Y: 64 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 781 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 781 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0441'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 10:01 Am |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/22/2012 @ 10:10 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/20/2012 @ 4:22 Pm |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 733 Yeas 64 Nays 44 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2012 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 781 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |