MI SB1279 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; electricians; electrical work for which licensure is required; exclude certain work in manufacturing or mining operations. Amends sec. 7 of 1956 PA 217 (MCL 338.887).
Title
Occupations; electricians; electrical work for which licensure is required; exclude certain work in manufacturing or mining operations. Amends sec. 7 of 1956 PA 217 (MCL 338.887).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 723 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Received On 10/17/2012 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 723 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |
Subjects
Occupations, electricians
Occupations, individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations, individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs