MI SB1264 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0577'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0577'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; other; Michigan civilian conservation corps; modify program and authorize another entity to establish and operate a Michigan civilian conservation corps. Amends 1984 PA 22 (MCL 409.301 - 409.313) by adding secs. 25 & 26. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1261'12, SB 1262'12, SB 1263'12, SB 1265'12
Title
Natural resources; other; Michigan civilian conservation corps; modify program and authorize another entity to establish and operate a Michigan civilian conservation corps. Amends 1984 PA 22 (MCL 409.301 - 409.313) by adding secs. 25 & 26. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1261'12, SB 1262'12, SB 1263'12, SB 1265'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 764 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 704 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 704 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0577'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 5:48 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 12:10 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 1:08 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 764 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Received On 10/17/2012 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 704 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |