MI SB1241 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; civil infraction procedures; provision regarding waiver of fine for violation of infant seat requirements; eliminate. Amends sec. 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.907).
Title
Traffic control; civil infraction procedures; provision regarding waiver of fine for violation of infant seat requirements; eliminate. Amends sec. 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.907).
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 719 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Received On 10/17/2012 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 719 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
Subjects
Children, other
Traffic control, civil infraction procedures
Traffic control, violations
Vehicles, equipment
Traffic control, civil infraction procedures
Traffic control, violations
Vehicles, equipment