MI SB1240 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0590'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Torts; liability; social services agency; grant immunity for providing child social welfare programs. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Torts; liability; social services agency; grant immunity for providing child social welfare programs. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1048 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 757 (Y: 63 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 759 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0590'12 With Immediate Effect
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/7/2013 @ 1:35 Pm
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 1/7/2013 @ 10:17 Am
2012-12-31SenatePresented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:18 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-13SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2012-12-13Senate Roll Call # 1048 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2012-12-13SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2012-12-12HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 757 Yeas 63 Nays 46
2012-12-12HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-11HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted And Amended
2012-12-11HouseRead A Second Time
2012-12-04HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-12-04HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2012-11-28HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2012-11-28HouseRead A First Time
2012-11-28HouseReceived On 11/28/2012
2012-11-28SenatePassed Roll Call # 759 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-11-27SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2012-11-27SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2012-10-17SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2012-10-17SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-10-17SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2012-09-11SenateReferred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-SB-1240
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2012-SIB-1240.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBS-1240.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBH-1240.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2012-SNB-1240.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0590.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-10-17-070.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-11-28-073.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-04-077.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-12-081.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-13-080.htm

Bill Comments

feedback