MI SB1232 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0565'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0565'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; adoption; Michigan Indian family preservation act (MIFPA); create. Amends 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.21 - 712A.32) by adding ch. XIIB.
Title
Children; adoption; Michigan Indian family preservation act (MIFPA); create. Amends 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.21 - 712A.32) by adding ch. XIIB.
Sponsors
Sen. Darwin Booher [R] | Sen. Thomas Casperson [R] | Sen. Judith Emmons [R] | Sen. Michael Green [R] |
Sen. Roger Kahn [R] | Sen. John Moolenaar [R] | Sen. Mike Nofs [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Sen. Howard Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 756 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 680 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 680 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0565'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 5:24 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 11:53 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 12:58 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 756 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Received On 09/27/2012 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 680 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |