MI SB1221 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Roll Call Roll Call # 489 Yeas 29 Nays 67 Excused 0 Not Voting 13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Roll Call Roll Call # 489 Yeas 29 Nays 67 Excused 0 Not Voting 13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: renaissance zones; certain property located in a renaissance zone; extend exemptions. Amends sec. 4 of 1996 PA 376 (MCL 125.2684).
Title
Economic development: renaissance zones; certain property located in a renaissance zone; extend exemptions. Amends sec. 4 of 1996 PA 376 (MCL 125.2684).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 489 Yeas 29 Nays 67 Excused 0 Not Voting 13 |
2022-12-07 | House | Adverse Roll Call |
2022-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-12-07 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-12-07 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-12-07 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2022-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-11-30 | House | Received On 11/29/2022 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 486 Yeas 21 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2022-11-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |