MI SB1210 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0502'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0502'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; brownfield redevelopment authority; community revitalization program and historic resources; include and provide other general amendments. Amends secs. 2, 4, 8, 13, 15 & 16 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2652 et seq.) & adds sec. 8a.
Title
Economic development; brownfield redevelopment authority; community revitalization program and historic resources; include and provide other general amendments. Amends secs. 2, 4, 8, 13, 15 & 16 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2652 et seq.) & adds sec. 8a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1045 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 775 (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 683 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 775 (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 683 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0502'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 4:16 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2012 @ 9:21 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:12 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 1045 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 775 Yeas 99 Nays 10 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Received On 09/27/2012 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 683 Yeas 31 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |