MI SB1208 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0272'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0272'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sex offender registration; sex offender registration fees; extend sunset. Amends sec. 5a of 1994 PA 295 (MCL 28.725a).
Title
Criminal procedure: sex offender registration; sex offender registration fees; extend sunset. Amends sec. 5a of 1994 PA 295 (MCL 28.725a).
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 478 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0272'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2022 04:40 Pm |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/22/2022 02:54 Pm |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/13/2022 03:15 Pm |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2022-12-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-12-06 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 481 Yeas 96 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2022-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-12-06 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-12-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-12-06 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-12-06 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-12-06 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-11-30 | House | Received On 11/29/2022 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 478 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-11-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tom Barrett |
Subjects
Criminal procedure: records
Criminal procedure: sex offender registration
Law: sunset
State agencies (existing): state police
Criminal procedure: sex offender registration
Law: sunset
State agencies (existing): state police