MI SB1207 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-30 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
Pending: House Elections And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-30 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
Pending: House Elections And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: presidential primary; presidential primary election date; revise. Amends sec. 613a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.613a).
Title
Elections: presidential primary; presidential primary election date; revise. Amends sec. 613a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.613a).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2022-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-11-30 | House | Received On 11/30/2022 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 511 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-10-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2022-10-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |