MI SB1196 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0376'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0376'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health; community mental health; board membership on certain community mental health services board; revise, and establish as a community mental health authority. Amends secs. 204, 212, 224 & 232a of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1204 et seq.) & repeals sec. 216 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1216).
Title
Mental health; community mental health; board membership on certain community mental health services board; revise, and establish as a community mental health authority. Amends secs. 204, 212, 224 & 232a of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1204 et seq.) & repeals sec. 216 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1216).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 820 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 657 (Y: 88 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 612 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 657 (Y: 88 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 612 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0376'12 |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2012 @ 4:44 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/14/2012 @ 9:52 Am |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/13/2012 @ 1:55 Pm |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Roll Call # 820 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-04 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-11-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-11-29 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-11-29 | House | Passed Roll Call # 657 Yeas 88 Nays 18 |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-11-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-29 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2012-11-29 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-09-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-09-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-08-15 | House | Received On 08/15/2012 |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 612 Yeas 24 Nays 13 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
Subjects
Human services, medical services
Mental health, code
Mental health, community mental health
State agencies (existing), community health
Mental health, code
Mental health, community mental health
State agencies (existing), community health