MI SB1172 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0521'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0521'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; foreclosure; mortgage modification negotiation procedures; extend sunset provision. Amends secs. 3204 & 3205e of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3204 & 600.3205e).
Title
Civil procedure; foreclosure; mortgage modification negotiation procedures; extend sunset provision. Amends secs. 3204 & 3205e of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3204 & 600.3205e).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 770 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 685 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 685 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0521'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 4:54 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2012 @ 9:19 Am |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 12:54 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 770 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Services |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Received On 09/27/2012 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 685 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |