MI SB1132 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0614'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0614'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; adoption; petition for adoption; allow a married spouse to adopt an adult individually under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 24, ch. X of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.24).
Title
Children; adoption; petition for adoption; allow a married spouse to adopt an adult individually under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 24, ch. X of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.24).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 755 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 743 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 743 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0614'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 3:54 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:36 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 12:52 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 755 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Received On 11/08/2012 |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 743 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |