MI SB1129 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
Pending: House Michigan Competitiveness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State financing and management; bonds; credit rating for issuance of a security to pay off unfunded pension or postemployment health care liability; revise. Amends sec. 518 of 2001 PA 34 (MCL 141.2518).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State financing and management; bonds; credit rating for issuance of a security to pay off unfunded pension or postemployment health care liability; revise. Amends sec. 518 of 2001 PA 34 (MCL 141.2518).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 694 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-05HouseReferred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
2018-12-05HouseRead A First Time
2018-12-05HouseReceived On 12/05/2018
2018-12-05SenatePassed Roll Call # 694 Yeas 28 Nays 9 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-12-04SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-12-04SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-12-04SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-11-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-11-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-11-29SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-09-26SenateReferred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
2018-09-26SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Stamas

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback