MI SB1125 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections: jails; sheriffs coordinating and training council to develop behavioral health and crisis response training for local corrections officers; require. Amends sec. 8 of 2003 PA 125 (MCL 791.538).
Title
Corrections: jails; sheriffs coordinating and training council to develop behavioral health and crisis response training for local corrections officers; require. Amends sec. 8 of 2003 PA 125 (MCL 791.538).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 430 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2020 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 430 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter J. Lucido |