MI SB1118 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0609'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Torts; medical malpractice; statute of limitations; revise period of limitations for survival actions and disallow prejudgment interest on attorney fees and costs. Amends secs. 2912e, 5852 & 6013 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2912e et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Torts; medical malpractice; statute of limitations; revise period of limitations for survival actions and disallow prejudgment interest on attorney fees and costs. Amends secs. 2912e, 5852 & 6013 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2912e et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 809 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 794 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0609'12
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 3:44 Pm
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:30 Pm
2012-12-31SenatePresented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:36 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-14SenateFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-14SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2012-12-14SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2012-12-13HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-13HouseInserted Full Title
2012-12-13HousePassed Roll Call # 809 Yeas 107 Nays 3
2012-12-13HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-12-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-13HouseRead A Second Time
2012-12-12HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-12-12HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2012-11-29HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2012-11-29HouseRead A First Time
2012-11-29HouseReceived On 11/29/2012
2012-11-29SenatePassed Roll Call # 794 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-11-29SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-11-29SenateRules Suspended
2012-11-29SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s)
2012-11-29SenateAmendment(s) Concurred In
2012-11-29SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s)
2012-11-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2012-11-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-11-29SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2012-05-03SenateReferred To Committee On Insurance

Same As/Similar To

HB5672 (Same As) 2012-05-24 - Printed Bill Filed 05/24/2012

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-SB-1118
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2012-SIB-1118.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBS-1118.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBH-1118.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2012-SNB-1118.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0609.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-11-29-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-12-081.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-13-082.htm

Bill Comments

feedback