MI SB1094 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-04 - Assigned Pa 0231'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health facilities: nursing homes; admittance of COVID-19-positive patients to nursing homes from another facility; prohibit, and develop centralized intake facilities.admittance of individuals who test positive for coronavirus in nursing homes; prohibit under certain circumstances, and require the department of health and human services to develop a process for the approval of certain centers and designated areas within nursing homes for individuals with coronavirus, implement certain visitation policies, and report certain information on coronavirus to the legislature. Amends sec. 21717 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.21717) & adds sec. 5145.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health facilities: nursing homes; admittance of COVID-19-positive patients to nursing homes from another facility; prohibit, and develop centralized intake facilities.admittance of individuals who test positive for coronavirus in nursing homes; prohibit under certain circumstances, and require the department of health and human services to develop a process for the approval of certain centers and designated areas within nursing homes for individuals with coronavirus, implement certain visitation policies, and report certain information on coronavirus to the legislature. Amends sec. 21717 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.21717) & adds sec. 5145.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 409 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 484 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 393 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-04SenateAssigned Pa 0231'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-11-04SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 10/22/2020 12:10 Pm
2020-11-04SenateApproved By Governor 10/22/2020 11:24 Am
2020-10-21SenatePresented To Governor 10/16/2020 01:30 Pm
2020-10-14SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 409 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-10-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-10-14SenateFull Title Agreed To
2020-10-14SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-10-14SenateHouse Substitute (h-3) Concurred In
2020-10-14HouseReturned To Senate
2020-10-14HouseInserted Full Title
2020-10-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 484 Yeas 101 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 8
2020-10-14HouseRead A Third Time
2020-10-14HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-10-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-10-14HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted And Amended
2020-10-14HouseRead A Second Time
2020-10-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-10-13HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
2020-10-13HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2020-10-13HouseRead A First Time
2020-10-08HouseReceived On 10/08/2020
2020-10-08SenatePassed Roll Call # 393 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-10-08SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-10-08SenateRules Suspended
2020-10-08SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) As Amended
2020-10-08SenateSubstitute (s-2) As Amended Concurred In
2020-10-08SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) And Amendment(s)
2020-09-23SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-23SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-09-23SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-09SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2020-09-09SenateIntroduced By Senator Peter J. Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-SB-1094
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2020-SIB-1094.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBS-1094.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBH-1094.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2020-SNB-1094.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0231.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-23-072.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-10-08-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-10-13-083.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-10-14-084.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-10-14-081.htm

Bill Comments

feedback