MI SB1092 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; juries; postponement of jury service; allow for farmers during certain months. Amends sec. 1335 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.1335).
Title
Courts; juries; postponement of jury service; allow for farmers during certain months. Amends sec. 1335 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.1335).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 607 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Received On 11/28/2018 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 607 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |