MI SB1090 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0348'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0348'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Family law: child support; abatement of support payment when the noncustodial parent is incarcerated; provide for. Amends sec. 5d of 1982 PA 295 (MCL 552.605d).
Title
Family law: child support; abatement of support payment when the noncustodial parent is incarcerated; provide for. Amends sec. 5d of 1982 PA 295 (MCL 552.605d).
Sponsors
Sen. John Bizon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 613 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 371 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 371 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0348'20 |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2020 01:16 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/30/2020 10:20 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2020 11:58 Am |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 613 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-09-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-09-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-30 | House | Received On 09/30/2020 |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 371 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Bizon, M.d. |