MI SB1085 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
Pending: House Commerce And Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
Pending: House Commerce And Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; Michigan strategic fund; definition of "qualified new job"; expand to include out-of-state resident employed by a company located in a county that borders another state or country. Amends sec. 88r of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2088r).
Title
Economic development; Michigan strategic fund; definition of "qualified new job"; expand to include out-of-state resident employed by a company located in a county that borders another state or country. Amends sec. 88r of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2088r).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 641 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 637 (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 637 (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2016-12-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-12-01 | House | Received On 11/30/2016 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 641 Yeas 23 Nays 13 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Defeated Roll Call # 637 Yeas 19 Nays 18 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale Zorn |