MI SB1085 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0238'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0238'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; fair employment practices; fair and open competition in government contracts act; clarify that the state is acting as a market participant in restricting certain contract requirements. Amends title & secs. 5, 7, 9 & 13 of 2011 PA 98 (MCL 408.875 et seq.) & adds secs. 2 & 8.
Title
Labor; fair employment practices; fair and open competition in government contracts act; clarify that the state is acting as a market participant in restricting certain contract requirements. Amends title & secs. 5, 7, 9 & 13 of 2011 PA 98 (MCL 408.875 et seq.) & adds secs. 2 & 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 478 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 370 (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 343 (Y: 63 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 353 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 370 (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 343 (Y: 63 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 353 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0238'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/29/2012 @ 2:38 Pm |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/26/2012 @ 1:14 Pm |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/19/2012 @ 11:42 Am |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-06-12 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 478 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-07 | House | Re-returned To Senate |
2012-06-07 | House | Passed Roll Call # 370 Yeas 63 Nays 44 |
2012-06-07 | House | Amended |
2012-06-07 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2012-06-07 | House | Rule Suspended |
2012-06-06 | House | Returned As Requested |
2012-06-06 | House | House Requests Return |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Immediate Effect Postponed |
2012-06-05 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-31 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-05-31 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 343 Yeas 63 Nays 47 |
2012-05-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-05-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-05-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-17 | House | Received On 05/17/2012 |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 353 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |
Subjects
Construction, contracts
Labor, discrimination
Labor, fair employment practices
Law, contracts
Local government, other
State financing and management, purchasing
Labor, discrimination
Labor, fair employment practices
Law, contracts
Local government, other
State financing and management, purchasing