MI SB1081 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-20 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-20 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; criteria for memorial highway renaming; designate to transportation asset management council. Amends title & sec. 2 of 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1002) & adds sec. 2a.
Title
Highways: memorial; criteria for memorial highway renaming; designate to transportation asset management council. Amends title & sec. 2 of 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1002) & adds sec. 2a.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 414 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2022-09-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-09-20 | House | Received On 09/20/2022 |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 414 Yeas 27 Nays 9 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tom Barrett |