MI SB1080 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; detainee or prisoner in holding cell, jail, or correctional facility throwing bodily material on certain individuals; prohibit, and provide a penalty. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 411x.
Title
Crimes; other; detainee or prisoner in holding cell, jail, or correctional facility throwing bodily material on certain individuals; prohibit, and provide a penalty. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 411x.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |
Same As/Similar To
HB5934 (Same As) 2016-10-19 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/22/2016