MI SB1072 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0451'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0451'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; nonnative species; permitted species list; eliminate, and require registration of persons selling live nonnative aquatic species. Amends secs. 1301, 41301, 41302, 41303, 41306 & 41325 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.1301 et seq.); adds secs. 41329, 41331, 41333, 41335, 41337 & 41341 & repeals sec. 41302a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.41302a).
Title
Natural resources; nonnative species; permitted species list; eliminate, and require registration of persons selling live nonnative aquatic species. Amends secs. 1301, 41301, 41302, 41303, 41306 & 41325 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.1301 et seq.); adds secs. 41329, 41331, 41333, 41335, 41337 & 41341 & repeals sec. 41302a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.41302a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 837 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 852 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 609 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 852 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 609 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0451'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2018 @ 11:56 Am |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/20/2018 @ 6:39 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/20/2018 @ 3:30 Pm |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call # 837 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 852 Yeas 106 Nays 3 |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-12-13 | House | Motion To Refer To Third Reading Reconsidered |
2018-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Received On 11/28/2018 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 609 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Kowall |
Subjects
Natural resources: nonnative species
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
State agencies (existing): natural resources
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
State agencies (existing): natural resources