MI SB1070 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0203'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0203'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: other; fund shift for the transportation economic development fund; provide for. Amends sec. 819 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.819).
Title
Vehicles: other; fund shift for the transportation economic development fund; provide for. Amends sec. 819 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.819).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 355 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 432 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 290 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 432 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 290 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0203'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2020 12:18 Pm |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/15/2020 09:48 Am |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/05/2020 11:48 Am |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 355 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-29 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-09-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 432 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-23 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-09-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-09-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-09-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-10 | House | Received On 09/10/2020 |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 290 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-08-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Adam J. Hollier |
Subjects
State financing and management: budget
State financing and management: funds
Transportation: funds
Vehicles: other
Vehicles: registration
State financing and management: funds
Transportation: funds
Vehicles: other
Vehicles: registration