MI SB1070 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; costs and fees; transcript fee; increase. Amends sec. 2543 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2543).
Title
Civil procedure; costs and fees; transcript fee; increase. Amends sec. 2543 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2543).
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hune [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 738 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2018 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 738 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Joe Hune |