MI SB1068 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0459'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0459'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; funds; requirement that cities and villages bear a portion of the cost of opening, widening, and improving state trunk line highways; eliminate. Amends sec. 1c of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651c).
Title
Transportation; funds; requirement that cities and villages bear a portion of the cost of opening, widening, and improving state trunk line highways; eliminate. Amends sec. 1c of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 853 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 747 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 698 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 747 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 698 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0459'16 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/5/2017 @ 11:16 Am 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/4/2017 @ 2:26 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/28/2016 @ 3:40 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Roll Call # 853 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-15 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-15 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-15 | House | Passed Roll Call # 747 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2016-12-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-12-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-12-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-12-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-12-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-12-07 | House | Received On 12/07/2016 |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 698 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Marty Knollenberg |