MI SB1062 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-29 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-29 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; collections; certain revenues attributable to transformational brownfield plans; capture and earmark. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 51e. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1061'16
Title
Individual income tax; collections; certain revenues attributable to transformational brownfield plans; capture and earmark. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 51e. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1061'16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 632 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 632 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 632 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2016-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2016 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 632 Yeas 30 Nays 7 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-09-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2016-09-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jack Brandenburg |