MI SB1062 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-04 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-04 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; exemptions; definition of qualified agricultural property; revise. Amends sec. 7dd of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7dd). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4302'11, HB 4969'11, HB 4970'11, SB 1057'12, SB 1058'12, SB 1059'12, SB 1061'12
Title
Property tax; exemptions; definition of qualified agricultural property; revise. Amends sec. 7dd of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.7dd). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4302'11, HB 4969'11, HB 4970'11, SB 1057'12, SB 1058'12, SB 1059'12, SB 1061'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 644 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 644 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-09-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-09-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-20 | House | Received On 09/20/2012 |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 644 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |