MI SB1047 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0394'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0394'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: warrants; procedures related to the issuance of bench warrants for failure to appear and for other processes related to arrest warrants; amend. Amends secs.1, 1a & 9e, ch. IV of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 764.1 et seq.) & adds sec. 10d to ch. 11, secs. 3 & 6f to ch. IV & sec. 6e to ch. V.
Title
Criminal procedure: warrants; procedures related to the issuance of bench warrants for failure to appear and for other processes related to arrest warrants; amend. Amends secs.1, 1a & 9e, ch. IV of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 764.1 et seq.) & adds sec. 10d to ch. 11, secs. 3 & 6f to ch. IV & sec. 6e to ch. V.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 604 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 600 (Y: 90 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 425 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 600 (Y: 90 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 425 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0394'20 |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/04/2021 01:20 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 01/04/2021 11:06 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2020 04:37 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 604 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 600 Yeas 90 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-12-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2020 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 425 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jeff Irwin |