MI SB1043 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0558'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil procedure; service of process; process server fees; revise, and allow fees for certain additional services. Amends sec. 2559 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2559).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure; service of process; process server fees; revise, and allow fees for certain additional services. Amends sec. 2559 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2559).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 791 (Y: 73 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 766 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 758 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0558'12 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 5:10 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 12:06 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-27SenatePresented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 10:44 Am
2012-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-13SenateFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-13SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2012-12-13SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2012-12-13HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-13HouseInserted Full Title
2012-12-13HousePassed Roll Call # 791 Yeas 73 Nays 34
2012-12-13HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-12HouseRead A Second Time
2012-12-06HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-12-06HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2012-11-28HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2012-11-28HouseRead A First Time
2012-11-28HouseReceived On 11/28/2012
2012-11-28SenatePassed Roll Call # 766 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-11-28SenateVote Reconsidered
2012-11-28SenatePassed Roll Call # 758 Yeas 29 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-11-27SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2012-11-27SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2012-11-27SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2012-09-20SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
2012-09-20SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-09-20SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-2
2012-03-27SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-SB-1043
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2012-SIB-1043.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBS-1043.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBH-1043.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2012-SNB-1043.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0558.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-09-20-067.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-11-28-073.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-06-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-13-082.htm

Bill Comments

feedback