MI SB1038 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0383'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0383'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security; reports; the Michigan employment security act requirements; revise to implement the new professional employer organization regulatory act. Amends 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.1 - 421.75) by adding sec. 13m. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1037'09
Title
Employment security; reports; the Michigan employment security act requirements; revise to implement the new professional employer organization regulatory act. Amends 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.1 - 421.75) by adding sec. 13m. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1037'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0383'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2010 @ 2:48 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/22/2010 @ 1:40 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Presented To Governor 12/20/2010 @ 12:12 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-15 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-15 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | Roll Call # 691 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-15 | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In | |
2010-12-15 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-15 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-15 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-15 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 627 Yeas 65 Nays 26 | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-15 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Second Reading | |
2010-12-15 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | |
2010-12-15 | Rule Suspended | |
2010-09-23 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform | |
2010-09-23 | Read A First Time | |
2010-09-23 | Received On 09/23/2010 | |
2010-09-23 | Passed Roll Call # 460 Yeas 32 Nays 4 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-09-23 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-09-23 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-09-23 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-23 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-09-23 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-05-19 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-05-19 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-05-19 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-12-17 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
Subjects
Employment security, contribution rate
Employment security, employers
Employment security, reports
Occupations, employment agencies
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth
Employment security, employers
Employment security, reports
Occupations, employment agencies
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth