MI SB1022 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0604'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0604'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; other; payment in lieu of taxes on certain state-owned land; revise. Amends secs. 2154 & 51106 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.2154 & 324.51106).
Title
Property tax; other; payment in lieu of taxes on certain state-owned land; revise. Amends secs. 2154 & 51106 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.2154 & 324.51106).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1054 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 795 (Y: 95 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 755 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 795 (Y: 95 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 755 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0604'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 3:34 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:18 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:28 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 1054 Yeas 23 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 795 Yeas 95 Nays 15 |
2012-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-11-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Received On 11/27/2012 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 755 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |