MI SB1020 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation
Pending: House Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation
Pending: House Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; other; operation of off-road vehicles on certain state highways; allow county board to authorize. Amends secs. 81115, 81129 & 81131 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.81115 et seq.).
Title
Natural resources; other; operation of off-road vehicles on certain state highways; allow county board to authorize. Amends secs. 81115, 81129 & 81131 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.81115 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 804 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2012 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 804 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Adopted |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
Subjects
Counties, other
Highways, local
Local government, other
Natural resources, other
Traffic control, traffic regulation
Vehicles, off-road
Highways, local
Local government, other
Natural resources, other
Traffic control, traffic regulation
Vehicles, off-road