MI SB1017 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; assaultive; assault of an individual with a developmental disability; increase penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 81f.
Title
Crimes; assaultive; assault of an individual with a developmental disability; increase penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 81f.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Morris Hood [D] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Same As/Similar To
HB5728 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2016