MI SB1012 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; construction; persons engaged in certain occupations related to residential building and contracting; revise exemptions from and requirements for licensure. Amends secs. 2403 & 2404b of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.2403 & 339.2404b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1011'16
Title
Occupations; construction; persons engaged in certain occupations related to residential building and contracting; revise exemptions from and requirements for licensure. Amends secs. 2403 & 2404b of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.2403 & 339.2404b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1011'16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 716 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2016-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-12-08 | House | Received On 12/08/2016 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 716 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |
Subjects
Occupations: construction
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
Occupations: residential builders
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
Occupations: residential builders
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs