MI SB1006 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0392'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0392'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services: food assistance; considering an individual ineligible for food assistance based on a felony conviction; prohibit. Amends sec. 10b of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.10b) & adds sec. 14m.
Title
Human services: food assistance; considering an individual ineligible for food assistance based on a felony conviction; prohibit. Amends sec. 10b of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.10b) & adds sec. 14m.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 583 (Y: 92 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 367 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 367 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0392'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/04/2021 01:16 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 01/04/2021 11:02 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2020 04:20 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 583 Yeas 92 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2020-12-16 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-12-16 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-09-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2020-09-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-30 | House | Received On 09/30/2020 |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 367 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) As Amended |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) As Amended Concurred In |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) And Amendment(s) |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Ananich |