MI SB0996 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0361'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0361'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; notaries public; recognition of notarial acts performed outside of this state; authorize in state notary statute. Amends title & secs. 1 & 11 of 2003 PA 238 (MCL 55.261 & 55.271) & adds sec. 25a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0664'17, SB 0997'18, SB 0998'18
Title
Occupations; notaries public; recognition of notarial acts performed outside of this state; authorize in state notary statute. Amends title & secs. 1 & 11 of 2003 PA 238 (MCL 55.261 & 55.271) & adds sec. 25a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0664'17, SB 0997'18, SB 0998'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 638 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 404 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 404 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0361'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/12/2018 @ 4:26 Pm |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/12/2018 @ 12:14 Pm |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/5/2018 @ 9:32 Am |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-11-27 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-11-27 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-11-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 638 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-09-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2018-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-06 | House | Received On 06/06/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 404 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |
Subjects
Civil procedure: evidence
Law: contracts
Occupations: notaries public
Property: conveyances
Public employees and officers: other
Law: contracts
Occupations: notaries public
Property: conveyances
Public employees and officers: other