MI SB0987 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; health insurers; health insurance claims assessment rate; modify under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 3 of 2011 PA 142 (MCL 550.1733). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0988'16, SB 0989'16, SB 0990'16
Title
Insurance; health insurers; health insurance claims assessment rate; modify under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 3 of 2011 PA 142 (MCL 550.1733). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0988'16, SB 0989'16, SB 0990'16
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Sen. Peter MacGregor [R] | Sen. Michael Shirkey [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 554 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 480 (Y: 62 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 411 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 480 (Y: 62 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 411 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2016-11-09 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 10/27/2016 |
2016-11-09 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/27/2016 @ 11:14 Am |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Roll Call # 554 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2016-09-22 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-09-22 | House | Title Amended |
2016-09-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 480 Yeas 62 Nays 45 |
2016-09-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-09-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-09-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2016-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-06-08 | House | Received On 06/08/2016 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 411 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ken Horn |