MI SB0969 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - Re-referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Liquor; other; use, possession, and sale of marihuana-infused alcohol; prohibit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liquor; other; use, possession, and sale of marihuana-infused alcohol; prohibit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 306 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-02HouseRe-referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2018-09-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-09-05HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-05-22HousePer Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2018-05-17HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2018-05-17HouseRead A First Time
2018-05-17HouseReceived On 05/17/2018
2018-05-17SenatePassed Roll Call # 306 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-05-16SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-05-16SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-05-16SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-05-10SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-05-10SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-05-10SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-05-01SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2018-05-01SenateIntroduced By Senator Rick Jones

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback