MI SB0968 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; traffic regulation; fine for violation of weight restrictions; make imposition of fine permissive. Amends sec. 724 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.724).
Title
Traffic control; traffic regulation; fine for violation of weight restrictions; make imposition of fine permissive. Amends sec. 724 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.724).
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 803 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2012 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 803 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |