MI SB0957 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; other; student safety act; eliminate sunset. Repeals enacting section 1 of 2013 PA 183.
Title
Law enforcement; other; student safety act; eliminate sunset. Repeals enacting section 1 of 2013 PA 183.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 419 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-06-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Received On 06/07/2018 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 419 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kenneth Horn |